Accounts and annual returns CHELFORD COMMUNITY HUB

Charity number: 1171886
Charity reporting is overdue by 1775 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days
Annual return 01 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 680 days
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 680 days
Annual return 01 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1045 days
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1045 days
Annual return 01 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1410 days
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1410 days
Annual return 01 September 2019 20 December 2020 172 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1775 days