Financial history COR MEIBION MORLAIS

Charity Number: 508740
Charity reporting is up to date (81 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.16k £11.31k £16.93k £16.55k £56.16k
Total expenditure £7.10k £9.17k £9.70k £12.20k £57.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k £5.00k £5.00k £15.51k