Accounts and annual returns THE CHARITY OF ELIZABETH HOPKINSON FOR THE POOR

Charity number: 508756
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 January 2020 351 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 July 2017 163 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required