Trustees MOCCAS VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 508769

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN FORSYTH | Chair | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Anna King | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Venvil | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paula Marie Shuman | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl King | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Austin | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James John Hicks | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Staff | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER FORSYTH | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN WINROW | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julia Whittall | Trustee | 09 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
OWEN WHITTALL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.