Financial history CONNECT FOR LIFE

Charity number: 1171169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £12.49k £22.58k £26.79k £24.58k £32.64k
Total expenditure £13.04k £17.37k £25.48k £19.57k £28.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.03k N/A N/A N/A