Accounts and annual returns AID BY AIR

Charity number: 1171248
Charity reporting is overdue by 1498 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days
Annual return 01 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 402 days
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 402 days
Annual return 01 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 768 days
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 768 days
Annual return 01 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1133 days
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1133 days
Annual return 01 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1498 days
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1498 days