Accounts and annual returns CENTRAL LONDON FORERUNNERS

Charity Number: 1169620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 July 2024 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 02 July 2024 153 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 26 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2021 26 January 2023 359 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 26 January 2023 359 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2020 17 May 2022 470 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 17 May 2022 470 days late Download Open in new window