Financial history MAWSLEY FC

Charity number: 1169248
Charity reporting is up to date (293 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £36.32k £46.40k £37.65k £50.84k £59.03k
Total expenditure £38.87k £31.18k £30.52k £65.73k £65.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A