Financial history BEAUTIFUL CHURCH LONDON

Charity number: 1171759
Charity reporting is overdue by 72 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023
Total gross income £85.96k £67.39k £80.61k £73.74k £77.04k
Total expenditure £71.78k £72.79k £62.42k £71.55k £84.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A