Trustees BAR HILL CHURCH
Charity number: 1170176

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Wendy Wale | Chair | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Jane Pryke | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hilson | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Chappell | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Joy Vendy | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Lucy Wright | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Horne | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iain Spence | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Leslie Cox | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Chappell | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Elizabeth Bennett | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Tod | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ingle | Trustee | 31 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.