Accounts and annual returns HORTON KIRBY PTA

Charity number: 1170118
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 16 July 2024 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 05 August 2022 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 August 2021 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 July 2020 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required