Financial history NETWORK FOR IMPROVING CRITICAL-CARE SYSTEMS AND TRAINING

Charity number: 1171106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.36k £62.51k £132.56k £154.99k £106.20k
Total expenditure £24.14k £10.08k £27.54k £108.93k £16.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A