Financial history BEXHILL AMATEUR BOXING CLUB

Charity number: 1171049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.49k £11.14k £12.21k £20.24k £23.58k
Total expenditure £18.88k £8.16k £20.11k £15.65k £29.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A