Financial history THE PARK, PORTHMADOG

Charity number: 508983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.53k £0 £0 £0 £11.64k
Total expenditure £20.44k £6.74k £7.32k £3.40k £10.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A