Trustees FRIENDS OF PADDOX SCHOOL

Charity number: 1170114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
kerry ward Chair 05 October 2020
None on record
Amnna Abdallah Trustee 21 October 2024
None on record
Angela Atkinson Trustee 21 October 2024
None on record
Olivia Jones Trustee 21 October 2024
None on record
Sarah louise Ellis Trustee 14 October 2022
None on record
Josephine Cressey Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Hannah Rourke Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
kimberley preston Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record