Financial history AUTISM FORWARD CIO

Charity number: 1171704
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £192.47k £52.36k £122.10k £83.42k £93.76k
Total expenditure £106.51k £67.17k £40.17k £117.00k £114.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A