Financial history PETTY POOL

Charity Number: 1174082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £2.46m £2.49m £2.72m £2.99m £3.58m
Total expenditure £2.30m £2.42m £2.72m £3.05m £3.75m
Income from government contracts £2.17m N/A £2.30m £2.41m £2.88m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £151.66k £16.46k £53.33k £42.38k £50.25k
Income - Other trading activities £425 £48.00k £48.00k £48.00k £48.00k
Income - Charitable activities £2.28m £2.41m £2.60m £2.88m £3.46m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £24.81k £17.04k £22.42k £23.27k £24.32k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £9.79k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.26m £2.41m £2.70m £3.04m £3.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds £40.20k £14.01k £17.83k £10.17k £55.79k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £82.96k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £9.19k £9.71k £10.17k £55.79k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0