Financial history THE NALDER TRUST

Charity number: 1173530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £26.09k £24.57k £29.13k £29.55k £29.55k
Total expenditure £16.56k £22.56k £29.79k £25.54k £18.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A