Financial history PINK PANTS TRUST

Charity Number: 1172437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £4.22k £78 £1.45k £1.19k £2.72k
Total expenditure £1.74k £0 £1.80k £1.31k £914
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A