Financial history SAXTON VILLAGE HALL CIO

Charity number: 1170075
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.83k £472 £14.64k £11.62k £15.30k
Total expenditure £11.00k £3.03k £5.12k £5.94k £12.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £8.00k N/A N/A