Financial history THE SQUEAKS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1171837
Charity reporting is overdue by 186 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £16.37k £979 £0 £51.40k £42
Total expenditure £6.36k £4.62k £5.40k £96 £88.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A