Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SHAW CUM DONNINGTON
Charity number: 1172611

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Raymond Clive Obin | Chair | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Sievers | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Eleanor Almond | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosamund Gillian Stuart | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derek Harwood | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Edward John Charles Yates | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Richard Joplin | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Willetts | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARY VERONICA DAWKINS | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK HUTSON | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mike Stuart | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA JANE BRADFORD | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL HASLAM | Trustee | 17 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MARY GOLDSACK | Trustee | 17 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.