Financial history THE FRIENDS OF WOLVERHAMPTON ART GALLERY

Charity number: 509278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £5.35k £4.38k £4.22k £5.10k £6.42k
Total expenditure £622 £652 £844 £1.34k £877
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A