Financial history PERFORMING ROOM

Charity Number: 1170745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.92k £119.72k £77.93k £86.88k £85.75k
Total expenditure £33.91k £79.06k £108.46k £111.73k £83.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £900 £41.50k £30.54k £8.50k £15.00k