Financial history THE CREATIVE LEARNING TRUST

Charity number: 1171949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.66k £1.99k £1.51k £1.45k £1.40k
Total expenditure £1.66k £630 £2.06k £924 £5.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A