Financial history CP TEENS UK

Charity Number: 1172105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.83k £7.11k £17.42k £19.89k £24.80k
Total expenditure £9.89k £8.86k £14.56k £18.83k £18.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A