Accounts and annual returns KADO PROJECTS CIO

Charity number: 1174341
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2020 09 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 09 February 2021 8 days late
Annual return 01 April 2019 30 June 2020 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 30 June 2020 150 days late
Annual return 01 February 2018 17 January 2019 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2018 31 January 2019 61 days late