Financial history BLOSSOM'S LEGACY

Charity number: 1172485
Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £34.06k £1.72k £1.87k £15.05k £9.72k
Total expenditure £4.53k £328 £5.41k £16.11k £13.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A