Financial history ENPALS

Charity number: 1175361
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £436 £10.37k £9.22k £602 £2.47k
Total expenditure £105 £0 £25.68k £293 £120
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £8.55k N/A N/A