Accounts and annual returns THE LE WILLOWS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 509500
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 December 2019 166 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required