Accounts and annual returns THE BEST FOOT FORWARD ORGANIZATION

Charity number: 1175564
Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days
Annual return 01 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days
Annual return 01 January 2022 30 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2021 30 October 2022 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 16 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required