Accounts and annual returns THE CROFT PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1173087
Charity reporting is up to date (102 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 October 2024 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required