Accounts and annual returns CHARLIE'S CHANCE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1174089
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2021 27 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 27 July 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2020 03 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 August 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2019 21 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 21 August 2020 On Time