Accounts and annual returns CITY OF TRUTH MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1172941
Charity reporting is up to date (88 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 January 2025 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 27 January 2025 88 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 April 2024 176 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 24 April 2024 176 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window