Financial history DONISTHORPE YOUTH CLUB

Charity Number: 1172057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.22k £12.29k £2.35k £3.81k £2.93k
Total expenditure £14.26k £1.51k £6.22k £8.04k £4.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £10.00k N/A N/A N/A