Financial history BULGARIAN FOLK, TRADITIONS AND CULTURE

Charity number: 1177972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.43k £505 £0 £3.98k £4.09k
Total expenditure £2.55k £470 £1.06k £4.47k £4.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A