Financial history THE UNIVERSITY OF QUEENSLAND UK TRUST

Charity number: 1176030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £32.60k £74.54k £6.89k £201 £11.82k
Total expenditure £27.52k £74.89k £8.42k £26 £10.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A