Financial history BROCKTON CHURCH TRUST

Charity Number: 509810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.72k £1.69k £2.10k £1.39k £4.38k
Total expenditure £1.93k £2.78k £2.32k £2.30k £3.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A