Financial history RECYCLED TEENAGER'S CLUB

Charity number: 1172448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £78.75k £44.21k £16.76k £58.72k £62.24k
Total expenditure £58.96k £28.01k £49.68k £49.18k £67.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.47k N/A N/A