Accounts and annual returns JESUS FAMILY CHAPEL INTL

Charity number: 1171926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 05 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 December 2023 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 December 2023 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 February 2023 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 05 February 2023 97 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 February 2023 462 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 February 2023 462 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window