Accounts and annual returns CREATED TO WORSHIP

Charity Number: 1177078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 May 2024 13 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2024 13 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 May 2023 05 September 2024 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2023 05 September 2024 188 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 May 2022 25 May 2023 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2022 25 May 2023 85 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 May 2021 27 February 2023 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2021 27 February 2023 363 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 May 2020 24 February 2022 360 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2020 24 February 2022 360 days late Download Open in new window