Accounts and annual returns THE SMILE AND OLIVE FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity number: 1177767
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 16 August 2024 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 16 August 2024 47 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 September 2023 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 13 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 March 2023 262 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 07 February 2023 222 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 May 2022 330 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 May 2022 330 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 July 2020 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required