Accounts and annual returns THE BRAMCOTE SCHOOL PTA

Charity Number: 1172583
Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 July 2021 370 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required