Financial history THE NOTTINGHAM ANNUITY CHARITY

Charity number: 510023
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £16.17k £69.42k £8.95k £34.72k £16.98k
Total expenditure £14.90k £14.55k £14.81k £15.12k £15.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A