Accounts and annual returns HAILE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 510045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 06 March 2025 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 01 September 2024 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 08 May 2023 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 08 May 2023 434 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 08 May 2023 799 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required