Trustees RIVER OAKS CHARITY
Charity number: 1175908

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Clare Dyer | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Thwaite | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter Shirlow | Trustee | 12 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Stuart Foster | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
GRACE RUTH PULMAN | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA KENNICK | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
COLIN JAMES LAFFERTY | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA HUGHES | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.