Financial history CREWE FC

Charity number: 1175805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £189.26k £95.95k £131.07k £135.68k £170.48k
Total expenditure £168.60k £85.25k £134.86k £131.77k £166.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A