Accounts and annual returns CHWAEN GOCH TURBINE FUND

Charity number: 1174517
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 03 March 2025 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 03 March 2025 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 03 March 2024 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 03 March 2024 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 19 March 2023 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 19 March 2023 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 28 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 28 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 09 March 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 09 March 2021 9 days late Download Open in new window