Accounts and annual returns LEIGH ON SEA U3A

Charity number: 1173276
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 27 February 2025 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 24 August 2024 240 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 17 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 14 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required