Accounts and annual returns ST. EDBURG'S PTA

Charity number: 1173423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 06 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 September 2023 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 October 2021 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 November 2020 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required